Global Patent Index - EP 0769101 B1

EP 0769101 B1 2000-02-02 - PROCESS FOR IMPROVING FUEL SPRAYING IN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR IMPROVING FUEL SPRAYING IN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER BRENNSTOFFZERSTÄUBUNG BEI VERBRENNUNGSMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER L'ATOMISATION DU CARBURANT DANS DES MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0769101 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95922392 A

Priority

  • CH 9500148 W
  • CH 212994 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9601366A1] It is known that enriching fuel with oxygen improves combustion and thus reduces fuel consumption, improves performance and reduces pollutant and soot particle emission. In order to prevent the air admixed into the fuel before the air is introduced into the combustion chamber from forming air bubbles in the supply pipe, the fuel-air mixture is selectively degassed depending on the size of the air bubbles. The fuel is fed by a feed pump (4), through a suction pipe (2), from a tank (1) into an apparatus (3), and from there into an internal combustion engine (5). Air is admixed by device (6). The apparatus (3) contains a degassing chamber (7) with a floater (8) that closes the lower admission (10) with a sealing cone (9) and that controls with an actuating pin (11) an inlet valve (12) depending on the level of fuel in the chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 71/02; F02M 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 33/00 (2006.01); F02M 71/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 33/00 (2013.01); F02M 71/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9601366 A1 19960118; AT 189505 T 20000215; AU 2730795 A 19960125; DE 59507747 D1 20000309; EP 0769101 A1 19970423; EP 0769101 B1 20000202; US 5829417 A 19981103

INPADOC legal status


2001-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010403

2001-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-07-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-06-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-05-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507747 20000309

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-02-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189505 T 20000215

1999-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIRTRON ENGNEERING AG .

1999-05-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NYFFENEGGER, HANS

1998-07-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980610

1997-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970117

1997-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE