Global Patent Index - EP 0769129 B1

EP 0769129 B1 2000-11-15 - BALLISTIC-RESISTANT ARTICLE AND PROCESS FOR MAKING THE SAME

Title (en)

BALLISTIC-RESISTANT ARTICLE AND PROCESS FOR MAKING THE SAME

Title (de)

BALLISTISCH WIDERSTANDSFÄHIGES ERZEUGNIS UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

ARTICLE BLINDE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 0769129 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93918113 A

Priority

  • US 9302474 W
  • US 85700092 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9320400A2] Ballistic-resistant articles comprise a plurality of polybenzoxazole or polybenzothiazole polymer fibers and are lighter, more comfortable to wear and exhibit better ballistic-resistant properties than existing ballistic-resistant articles of equal weight.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 5/04; C08G 73/08; C08G 73/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 1/02 (2006.01); A41D 13/00 (2006.01); A41D 31/00 (2006.01); A42B 3/00 (2006.01); C08G 73/18 (2006.01); C08G 73/22 (2006.01); C08G 75/00 (2006.01); C08G 75/32 (2006.01); C08J 5/04 (2006.01); D01F 6/74 (2006.01); D03D 15/00 (2006.01); F41H 1/04 (2006.01); F41H 5/00 (2006.01); F41H 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/047 (2013.01); C08G 75/32 (2013.01); D03D 1/0052 (2013.01); D03D 15/00 (2013.01); D03D 15/0011 (2013.01); F41H 5/0485 (2013.01); D10B 2101/06 (2013.01); D10B 2201/02 (2013.01); D10B 2201/24 (2013.01); D10B 2321/021 (2013.01); D10B 2321/06 (2013.01); D10B 2331/02 (2013.01); D10B 2331/021 (2013.01); D10B 2331/04 (2013.01); D10B 2331/061 (2013.01); D10B 2331/14 (2013.01); D10B 2401/041 (2013.01); D10B 2401/062 (2013.01); D10B 2401/063 (2013.01); D10B 2501/04 (2013.01); D10B 2505/00 (2013.01); Y10S 428/911 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24994 (2015.04); Y10T 442/2623 (2015.04); Y10T 442/3293 (2015.04); Y10T 442/3976 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9320400 A2 19931014; WO 9320400 A3 19931223; AU 4767993 A 19931108; CA 2131701 A1 19931014; CA 2131701 C 20031014; DE 69329688 D1 20001221; DE 69329688 T2 20010628; EP 0769129 A2 19970423; EP 0769129 B1 20001115; JP 3531163 B2 20040524; JP H07505466 A 19950615; US 2003207631 A1 20031106; US 2006270299 A1 20061130; US 6268301 B1 20010731

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-17 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20080219

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

- Effective date: 20010807

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090318

2009-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TOYOBO CO. LTD

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080916

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080313

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080311

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080312

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080327

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080316

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

2007-04-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

- Effective date: 20010807

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

2001-10-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-02-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69329688 20001221

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

1998-09-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980807

1998-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TOYOBO CO., LTD.

1997-11-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY

1997-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940908

1997-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL