EP 0769333 A1 19970423 - Method for continuously producing, in a line, rolled sheet metal strip of stainless steel with improved surface condition
Title (en)
Method for continuously producing, in a line, rolled sheet metal strip of stainless steel with improved surface condition
Title (de)
Verfahren zur kontinuierlichen Herstellung in einer Linie von einem aus nichtrostendem Stahl gewalzten Blechband mit verbessertem Oberflächenzustand
Title (fr)
Procédé d'élaboration, sur une ligne, en continu, d'une bande de tole laminée d'acier inoxydable présentant un état de surface améliorée
Publication
Application
Priority
FR 9512271 A 19951019
Abstract (en)
The hot rolled stainless steel strip is subjected to a continuous surface treatment process comprising flattening the surface whilst residually elongating the strip by 1-5% in order to crack the oxide coating, pickling to remove the oxide, cold rolling in a max. of three passes, final annealing, final pickling, and skin passing. Also claimed is the industrial line for carrying out the above process, with the pickling station being a spray or electrolytic-type process. In the latter the electrolyte is a neutral salt or phosphoric acid. The cold rolling appts. is at least three cages of multi-cylinders of dia. below 180, pref. below 150 mm.
Abstract (fr)
Procédé d'élaboration sur une ligne, en continu, d'une bande de tôle laminée d'acier inoxydable présentant un état de surface amélioré caractérisé en ce que la tôle élaborée à chaud, est soumise principalement à : un planage sous traction produisant un allongement résiduel de 1 à 5%, pour fissurer la couche d'oxyde et planer la tôle, un décapage primaire assurant le retrait de la calamine, un laminage à froid en au plus trois passes de laminage, un recuit final, un décapage final, un laminage à froid de type "skin pass". <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B24C 1/08 (2006.01); B21B 1/28 (2006.01); B21B 3/02 (2006.01); B21B 45/06 (2006.01); B21D 1/05 (2006.01); C21D 9/46 (2006.01); C23G 3/02 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR US)
B21B 1/22 (2013.01 - KR); B21B 1/28 (2013.01 - EP US); B21B 45/06 (2013.01 - EP US); C23G 3/028 (2013.01 - EP US); B21B 3/02 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [PA] EP 0695808 A1 19960207 - BWG BERGWERK WALZWERK [DE]
- [PA] EP 0723024 A1 19960724 - SUNDWIGER EISEN MASCHINEN [DE]
- [PA] EP 0706840 A2 19960417 - MANNESMANN AG [DE]
- [A] EP 0195385 A2 19860924 - NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]
- [A] EP 0644276 A1 19950322 - HITACHI LTD [JP]
- [A] US 4609594 A 19860902 - ODASHIMA HISAO [JP], et al
- [A] US 5197179 A 19930330 - SENDZIMIR MICHAEL G [US], et al
- [A] FR 2246321 A1 19750502 - BWG BERGWERK WALZWERK [DE]
- [A] BOUTEILLE J L ET AL: "L'USINE A FROID DE DEMAIN", CAHIERS D'INFORMATIONS TECHNIQUES DE LA REVUE DE METALLURGIE, vol. 87, no. 1, 1 January 1990 (1990-01-01), pages 89 - 95, XP000126499
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 003 (C - 086) 9 January 1982 (1982-01-09)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 651 (M - 1519) 3 December 1993 (1993-12-03)
- [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 7848, Derwent World Patents Index; Class M21, AN 78-86872A [48], XP002009228
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0769333 A1 19970423; EP 0769333 B1 20020109; AT E211662 T1 20020115; AU 7031196 A 19970424; AU 716533 B2 20000224; BR 9605201 A 19980721; CA 2188315 A1 19970420; CA 2188315 C 20040914; CN 1065458 C 20010509; CN 1156065 A 19970806; DE 69618414 D1 20020214; DE 69618414 T2 20020829; DK 0769333 T3 20020422; ES 2170214 T3 20020801; FR 2740061 A1 19970425; FR 2740061 B1 19971128; JP 3888396 B2 20070228; JP H09122710 A 19970513; KR 100395288 B1 20031224; KR 970020236 A 19970528; MX 9604877 A 19971031; PT 769333 E 20020628; TW 438635 B 20010607; US 5820704 A 19981013; ZA 968722 B 19980416
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 96402086 A 19961001; AT 96402086 T 19961001; AU 7031196 A 19961021; BR 9605201 A 19961021; CA 2188315 A 19961018; CN 96112782 A 19961018; DE 69618414 T 19961001; DK 96402086 T 19961001; ES 96402086 T 19961001; FR 9512271 A 19951019; JP 29772896 A 19961021; KR 19960046451 A 19961017; MX 9604877 A 19961016; PT 96402086 T 19961001; TW 85112810 A 19961019; US 73387296 A 19961018; ZA 968722 A 19961016