Global Patent Index - EP 0769349 B1

EP 0769349 B1 2001-02-21 - Grinding machine for plates having an adjustable abrasive roller

Title (en)

Grinding machine for plates having an adjustable abrasive roller

Title (de)

Schleifmaschine für Platten mit einer verstellbaren Schleifwelle

Title (fr)

Meuleuse pour plaques avec un rouleau abrasif réglable

Publication

EP 0769349 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96116479 A

Priority

IT MO950146 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0769349A1] The grinding machine has rollers (1) adjustable through angle (A), non-zero and not a right angle, with respect to the direction (T) transverse to the direction (M) of movement of the plates or tiles (2) being machined. The cutting front is shorter than the length (L) of the roller: it is thereby possible to adjust the format of the machining to a width (P) of the material as required, even with unusual formats. The inclination of the roller is achieved (Fig. 2) by adjusting the support structure (7), rotating on the vertical axis (S) of the support column (8): means for locking the rotation (28) serve to stiffen the structure (Fig. 3); there is also means for rapid retraction (18, 23) with short stroke that distances the abrasive roller during the phases in which the production line on which the grinder is positioned is stopped. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 41/047; B24B 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 7/22 (2006.01); B24B 41/047 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 7/22 (2013.01); B24B 41/047 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0769349 A1 19970423; EP 0769349 B1 20010221; DE 69611812 D1 20010329; IT 1279870 B1 19971218; IT MO950146 A1 19970419; IT MO950146 D0 19951018

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111015

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101028

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-07-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-05-22 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010522

2001-04-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FINDEROUTE - GASPARINI ALBERTO

2001-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611812 20010329

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT NL

2001-02-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-02-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-02-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010221

2000-03-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980826

1998-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980826

1997-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970722

1997-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT NL