Global Patent Index - EP 0769464 B1

EP 0769464 B1 2001-03-28 - Blow box connecting wall

Title (en)

Blow box connecting wall

Title (de)

Blaskasten-Verbindungswand

Title (fr)

Parois de connexion d'un caisson de soufflage

Publication

EP 0769464 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96114133 A

Priority

DE 19538972 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0769464A2] The connecting wall is fixed at a slope between the fixed side walls (1.1,1.2). The slope is such that the remaining paper in the blast box can slide down over the perforated connecting wall (10). The blast box has reinforcement ridges (11). At least one of the side walls has an opening (12) in front of which is a swivel flap (13) for closing it. the connecting wall above the compressed air connections (1.3) is positioned in the blast box.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/26; B65H 18/20; B65H 26/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/20 (2006.01); B65H 18/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/26 (2013.01); B65H 18/20 (2013.01); B65H 2406/00 (2013.01); B65H 2406/13 (2013.01); B65H 2408/2321 (2013.01); B65H 2515/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FI FR LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0769464 A2 19970423; EP 0769464 A3 19971119; EP 0769464 B1 20010328; AT 200066 T 20010415; CA 2188340 A1 19970420; DE 19538972 A1 19970424; ES 2155910 T3 20010601; JP H09110244 A 19970428

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20021011

2003-07-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-06-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-05-07 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010921

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010905

2001-09-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010905

2001-09-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-09-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155910 T3

2001-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606659 20010503

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR LI SE

2001-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200066 T 20010415

2001-01-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

1999-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991027

1999-01-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR LI SE

1997-11-05 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65H 18/26

1997-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960904

1997-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR LI SE