Global patent index - EP 0769465 B1

EP 0769465 B1 2001-03-21 - King roll winding machine

Title (en)

King roll winding machine

Title (de)

Tragwalzen-Wickelmaschine

Title (fr)

Bobineuse à cylindres porteurs

Publication

EP 0769465 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96114134 A

Priority

DE 19538973 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0769465A2] The web of material winds round the first of two king rolls (1,2) from the bottom. A stationary blast box (6) is positioned on the side of the king rolls facing the reels' bed and has a compressed air connection (6). Each of the two walls of the blast box is sealed by sealing elements against the outer surface of one of the two king rolls. A separating element is brought into operating position between the second king roll's (2) outer surface and the support part of the blast box.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/20; B65H 18/26; B65H 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/20 (2006.01); B65H 18/26 (2006.01); B65H 19/22 (2006.01); B65H 26/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/2246 (2013.01); B65H 18/20 (2013.01); B65H 18/26 (2013.01); B65H 19/26 (2013.01); B65H 2406/13 (2013.01); B65H 2406/131 (2013.01); B65H 2408/2321 (2013.01); B65H 2515/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FI FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0769465 A2 19970423; EP 0769465 A3 19971119; EP 0769465 B1 20010321; AT 199878 T 20010415; CA 2188342 A1 19970420; DE 19538973 A1 19970424; ES 2156243 T3 20010616; JP H09124196 A 19970513; US 5848760 A 19981215

INPADOC legal status

2007-05-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2006-09-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060905

2006-09-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060904

2005-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040906

2005-09-15 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050915

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050914

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050912

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050904

2004-09-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040906

2003-09-10 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030910

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-07-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-09-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2156243

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-05-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606619

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-26

2001-04-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR IT SE

2001-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 199878

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000229

1999-01-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR IT SE

1997-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960904

1997-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR IT SE