Global Patent Index - EP 0769564 B1

EP 0769564 B1 2001-12-12 - Welded structures with improved mechanical properties made of AlMg alloys

Title (en)

Welded structures with improved mechanical properties made of AlMg alloys

Title (de)

Geschweisste Strukturen mit verbesserten mechanischen Eigenschaften aus AlMg-Legierungen

Title (fr)

Constructions soudées à caractéristiques mécaniques améliorées en alliage AlMg

Publication

EP 0769564 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96420311 A

Priority

FR 9512466 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0769564A1] AlMg alloy consists of in wt.%:-4.2-4.8 Mg; less than 0.5 Mn; less than 0.4 Zn; less than 0.45 Fe; less than 0.3 Si; and possibly less than 0.15 Cr; less than 0.25 Cu; less than 0.2 Ti; less than 0.2 Zr; other elements less than 0.05 each and less than 0.15 in total; balance Al with Mn+Zn less than 0.7.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/06; B23K 101/04; B23K 103/10; B65D 88/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/06 (2006.01); C22F 1/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/047 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/047 (2013.01); C22C 21/06 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

  • JP S6220785 A 19870129 - YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD
  • ASM Specialty Handbook,1994, Edit. J.R. Davis, Davis & Associates, pp 43,44,74,75,376,678
  • R. Deschamps "Contribution à l'étude de la vitesse de fisuration par fatigue à basse température dans l'alliage d'aluminium 5083", Métaux-Corrosion- Industrie, 52e année, vol. 21, juillet-août 1976, pp 278-291

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0769564 A1 19970423; EP 0769564 B1 20011212; DE 1178125 T1 20020704; DE 69617872 D1 20020124; DE 69617872 T2 20020627; DE 769564 T1 19970911; EP 1178125 A2 20020206; EP 1178125 A3 20090401; FR 2740144 A1 19970425; FR 2740144 B1 19971121; JP H09111386 A 19970428; KR 100428237 B1 20040727

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-07-25 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20070529

2007-07-25 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20070529

2007-05-30 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALCAN RHENALU

2007-04-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPRODUKTE GMBH

- Effective date: 20020910

2007-04-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ALCOA INC.

- Effective date: 20020911

2007-04-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HYDRO ALUMINIUM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20020912

2007-04-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM NV

- Effective date: 20020912

2006-09-22 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060921

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060920

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051015

2004-02-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPRODUKTE GMBH

- Effective date: 20020910

2004-02-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ALCAN DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20020911

2004-02-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ALCOA INC.

- Effective date: 20020911

2004-02-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HYDRO ALUMINIUM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20020912

2004-02-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM NV

- Effective date: 20020912

2003-09-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPRODUKTE GMBH

- Effective date: 20020910

2003-09-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ALCAN DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20020911

2003-09-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ALCOA INC.

- Effective date: 20020911

2003-09-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HYDRO ALUMINIUM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20020912

2003-09-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM NV

- Effective date: 20020912

2002-12-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPRODUKTE GMBH

- Effective date: 20020910

2002-12-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ALCAN ALUMINIUMWERKE GMBH

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-12-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ALCOA INC.

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-12-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HYDRO ALUMINIUM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20020912

2002-12-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM NV

- Effective date: 20020912

2002-11-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPRODUKTE GMBH

- Effective date: 20020910

2002-11-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ALCAN ALUMINIUMWERKE GMBH

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-11-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ALCOA INC.

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-11-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HYDRO ALUMINIUM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20020912

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020322

2002-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WILLIAM BLANC & CIE CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRI

2002-04-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Free text: PECHINEY RHENALU,6, PLACE DE L'IRIS TOUR MANHATTAN LA DEFENSE 2,92400 COURBEVOIE (FR) TRANSFER- PECHINEY RHENALU,7, PLACE DU CHANCELIER ADENAUER,75116 PARIS (FR)

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69617872 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2001-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 22C 21/06 A, 7B 65D 88/12 B, 7B 23K 101/04 B, 7B 23K 103/10 B

2001-05-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: WELDED STRUCTURES WITH IMPROVED MECHANICAL PROPERTIES MADE OF ALMG ALLOYS

1999-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990408

1997-09-11 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970618

1997-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI