Global Patent Index - EP 0769601 B1

EP 0769601 B1 2001-01-17 - Door linkage system for vehicle doors

Title (en)

Door linkage system for vehicle doors

Title (de)

Türanlenksystem für Kraftwagentüren

Title (fr)

Système d'articulation pour portes de véhicules

Publication

EP 0769601 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115703 A

Priority

DE 19537819 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0769601A1] The door (1) hinge links (3) are spaced vertically apart and each consists of a link half connected to the door column and to the door. The two link halves are joined by a hinge pin forming a hinge axle. The two link halves of at least one side, door column side and or door side, are joined by a rabbet (6) gripping over the vertical space between the link halves. The two link halves and rabbet are made of one cast part, especially injection moulded part made of light material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 5/02; E05D 5/14; E05D 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/02 (2006.01); E05D 5/14 (2006.01); E05D 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/105 (2013.01); E05D 5/0207 (2013.01); E05D 5/16 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/531 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19537819 A1 19970417; EP 0769601 A1 19970423; EP 0769601 B1 20010117; ES 2154767 T3 20010416

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031112

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-08-15 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-05-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-10-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021017

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-10-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-10-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-01-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20011024

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011011

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-01 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20011001

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010914

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154767 T3

2001-03-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-02-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606340 20010222

2001-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ED. SCHARWAECHTER GMBH

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990126

1997-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961001

1997-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE