Global Patent Index - EP 0769622 B1

EP 0769622 B1 2000-11-08 - Vane motor

Title (en)

Vane motor

Title (de)

Flügelzellenmotor

Title (fr)

Moteur à palettes

Publication

EP 0769622 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96114123 A

Priority

DE 29516570 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0769622A1] The double lamellae (4) of the motor are arranged in a pair to move radially and towards each other by pressure and leg springs (12,13). The double lamella is guided in a rotor (1) whose recess (5) is at least 4% greater than the thickness of the lamella. The recesses are each arranged at an angle of 72 degrees from each other in the rotor and the lamella has a notch (24), pointing towards the inside wall of the recess. The slide bearing discs (6) are provided in the right outer housing and left outer housing to absorb the axial forces of the rotor and also form the inner wall (8) for the chamber space (9) which is formed from the recess in the rotor and disc.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/344

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01C 21/08 (2006.01); F03C 2/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F03C 2/304 (2013.01); F01C 21/0881 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29516570 U1 19951221; AT 197492 T 20001111; EP 0769622 A1 19970423; EP 0769622 B1 20001108

INPADOC legal status


2016-09-04 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606122

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110904

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 197492 T

- Effective date: 20110904

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110904

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120401

2012-06-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110904

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110904

2012-04-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120401

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101015

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100930

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100901

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100902

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100918

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-10-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-08-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-06-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: BUEMACH ENGINEERING INTERNATIONAL B.V.

- Effective date: 20070323

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010124

2000-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606122 20001214

2000-11-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2000-11-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197492 T 20001111

2000-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000331

1997-07-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1997-06-06 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1997-05-28 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1997-04-29 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: JACOBACCI CASETTA & PERANI S.P.A.

1997-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960904

1997-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL