Global Patent Index - EP 0769661 A3

EP 0769661 A3 2000-02-23 - Indoor unit of an air conditioner

Title (en)

Indoor unit of an air conditioner

Title (de)

Innenraumeinheit für eine Klimaanlage

Title (fr)

Unité intérieure d'un dispositif de conditionnement d'air

Publication

EP 0769661 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 96116567 A

Priority

JP 26821095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0769661A2] An indoor unit of an air conditioner having a front frame 1 composing an outer cover, and an intake grille 2, attachable to the front frame, also composing the outer cover and being free for opening and closing. The front frame 1 is provided with a fixed arc rib 1a and 1b which is concentric with an imaginary center 3 of open/close rotating movement of the intake grille 2. The intake grille 2 is provided with rotary arc ribs 2a and 2b or a projection 2d, having a groove 2c, which is/are also concentric with the imaginary center 3, and engage(s) with the fixed rib 1a and 1b over the range of the open/close rotating movement. The present invention thus simplifies mold structure, improves strength and accuracy, and reduces restrictions in design to provide better quality and more inexpensive indoor unit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 1/02; F24F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/08 (2006.01); F24F 13/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/08 (2013.01); F24F 1/0007 (2013.01); F24F 13/084 (2013.01); F24F 2001/0048 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4333206 A 19820608 - LANG RICHARD D, et al
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 02 29 February 1996 (1996-02-29)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 013 (M - 1069) 11 January 1991 (1991-01-11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0769661 A2 19970423; EP 0769661 A3 20000223; EP 0769661 B1 20050126; CN 1103031 C 20030312; CN 1150637 A 19970528; ES 2236723 T3 20050716; JP 3379303 B2 20030224; JP H09112950 A 19970502; MY 121901 A 20060331

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111017

2013-05-31 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130531

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111016

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-06-18 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20050401221

- Effective date: 20120503

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101026

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-12-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-12-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2236723 T3

2005-05-18 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050401221

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GR IT

2002-10-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020906

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000203

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): ES FR GR IT

1997-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR GR IT