Global patent index - EP 0769663 A3

EP 0769663 A3 2000-01-19 - Split type air conditioner and method of controlling it

Title (en)

Split type air conditioner and method of controlling it

Title (de)

Unterteiltes Klimagerät und Steuerverfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Appareil de climatisation à unités séparées et sa méthode de commande

Publication

EP 0769663 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 96116438 A

Priority

JP 26821195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0769663A2] A split type air conditioner having a wireless remote controller (4) for issuing a demand signal, and an electronic control device (7) for controlling an indoor unit (1) and an outdoor unit (2) basing on the demand signal, wherein the electronic control device has an EEPROM (7e) for storing the demand signal. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 11/00; F24F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/02 (2006.01); F24F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/006 (2013.01); F24F 1/0003 (2013.01); F24F 2011/0068 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0769663 A2 19970423; EP 0769663 A3 20000119; EP 0769663 B1 20020710; CN 1090737 C 20020911; CN 1157899 A 19970827; ES 2179907 T3 20030201; JP 3463427 B2 20031105; JP H09113011 A 19970502; MY 130335 A 20070629

INPADOC legal status

2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131015

2014-11-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20141107

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140505

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131014

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-06-26 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ML

- Ref Document Number: 20020403244

- Country of Ref Document: GR

- Effective date: 20140505

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121019

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121013

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121018

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20120919

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-11-13 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2003-07-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030411

2003-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2179907

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-11-13 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20020403244

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2002-10-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GR IT

2000-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000801

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): ES FR GR IT

1997-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961014

1997-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR GR IT