Global Patent Index - EP 0769794 B1

EP 0769794 B1 2000-04-26 - Electrical component protection device

Title (en)

Electrical component protection device

Title (de)

Schutzvorrichtung für elektrisches Bauteil

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection pour composant électrique

Publication

EP 0769794 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96116493 A

Priority

JP 26820695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0769794A1] By pressing the periphery of an overload relay 7 by a rib 8 formed integrally with a terminal cover 3 and pressing the center of the overload relay 7 by a retainer bushing 10 against an upper surface of a hermetic casing 1, the rear surface of the overload relay 7 is securely made to adhere closely to the upper surface of the hermetic casing 1. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 61/00; H01H 37/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/00 (2006.01); F04C 29/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/00 (2006.01); H01H 37/54 (2006.01); H01H 61/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/5436 (2013.01); H01H 61/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0769794 A1 19970423; EP 0769794 B1 20000426; CN 1078964 C 20020206; CN 1154444 A 19970716; ES 2146345 T3 20000801; GR 3033580 T3 20000929; JP H09112424 A 19970502; MY 116570 A 20040228

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081016

2009-12-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081016

2009-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090505

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081015

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20070919

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071009

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071027

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071102

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146345 T3

2000-07-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GR IT

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990114

1997-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970605

1997-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GR IT