Global Patent Index - EP 0769826 B1

EP 0769826 B1 2000-03-22 - Connecting block of electrical conductors to an electrical apparatus

Title (en)

Connecting block of electrical conductors to an electrical apparatus

Title (de)

Anschlussblock von elektrischen Leitungen an einem elektrischen Gerät

Title (fr)

Bloc de raccordement de conducteurs électriques à un appareil électrique

Publication

EP 0769826 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402168 A

Priority

FR 9512327 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0769826A1] The cable connection block for an electrical apparatus comprises a number of connectors (4). Each comprises a cage (42) and a cable grip slide (43) movable under the action of a clamp screw (44) within a hole (37,38) in the box (31) housing this connector. The slide (43) has a U-shape, of which one branch is situated at the level of the screw head (44). This branch carries a movable protective insulating cap (35) on its front. This follows the movements of the slide and allows access to the heat of the screw. The front cap (35) covers the bottom of the wire grip slide (43) so as to cover or partially obscure the hole (38) in the box provided for the entry of the cables.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/514 (2006.01); H01R 4/38 (2006.01); H01R 9/22 (2006.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0769826 A1 19970423; EP 0769826 B1 20000322; AU 7026996 A 19970424; AU 709393 B2 19990826; BR 9605159 A 19980714; CN 1104017 C 20030326; CN 1153991 A 19970709; DE 69607280 D1 20000427; DE 69607280 T2 20000713; ES 2144711 T3 20000616; FR 2740265 A1 19970425; FR 2740265 B1 19971114; JP H09180806 A 19970711; RU 2158456 C2 20001027; TW 374265 B 19991111; US 5846101 A 19981208; ZA 9608760 B 19970527

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111012

2013-04-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130418

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111012

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111011

2012-08-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69607280

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-07-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100828

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100907

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-12-27 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144711 T3

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607280 20000427

2000-04-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-03-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990803

1999-08-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

1997-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961018

1997-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE