Global Patent Index - EP 0769978 B1

EP 0769978 B1 2000-03-22 - ROLLER SKI

Title (en)

ROLLER SKI

Title (de)

SKIROLLER

Title (fr)

SKI A ROULETTES

Publication

EP 0769978 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95922408 A

Priority

  • DE 9500807 W
  • DE 4424372 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4424372A1] The present invention relates to a training device for cross-country skiing exercises in summer. The aim of the invention is to develop a roller ski giving the best possible simulation of the actual pressure and sliding behaviour of cross-country skis in their use for training in both the diagonal step and skating techniques. The invention attains this aim in that the roller ski base consists of prestressed fibre laminate or composite fibre laminate materials, preferably in the form of a hollow section, and of adjustable brake actuation, tensioning and return components. Said brake actuation components act on the braking strip or brake lever(s) of a braking device which brake a ring of a ratchet device, where the other ring of the ratchet device is fitted integrally with the roller of the roller ski and can rotate together therewith on a spindle of the ski roller.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 17/14; A63C 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/06 (2006.01); A63C 17/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/035 (2013.01); A63C 17/045 (2013.01); A63C 17/1409 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4424372 A1 19960118; AT 190858 T 20000415; CZ 288255 B6 20010516; CZ 9603830 A3 19971112; EP 0769978 A1 19970502; EP 0769978 B1 20000322; FI 965247 A0 19961230; FI 965247 A 19961230; NO 306287 B1 19991018; NO 970116 A 19970110; NO 970116 D0 19970110; SK 132796 A3 19970305; SK 282622 B6 20021008; WO 9601672 A1 19960125

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2002-11-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021113

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010617

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010129

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KRAUS HORST

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-07 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20000807

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ANNEMARIE RUBIN

2000-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508066 20000427

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2000-03-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190858 T 20000415

1997-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971104

1997-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961105

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI NL SE