Global Patent Index - EP 0770151 B1

EP 0770151 B1 2000-10-11 - THE PROCESS FOR MECHANICAL TREATMENT OF WOODY PRODUCTS, THE PRODUCT THUS OBTAINED AND ITS USE

Title (en)

THE PROCESS FOR MECHANICAL TREATMENT OF WOODY PRODUCTS, THE PRODUCT THUS OBTAINED AND ITS USE

Title (de)

MECHANISCHES VERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR HOLZARTIGE PRODUKTE, DAS DADURCH ERHALTENE PRODUKT UND SEINE VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT MECANIQUE DE PRODUITS LIGNEUX, PRODUIT AINSI OBTENU ET SON UTILISATION

Publication

EP 0770151 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95922719 A

Priority

  • IT 9500107 W
  • IT RM940436 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9601337A1] The process of mechanical treatment of woody parts of annual or polyannual plants covers the preparatory phases of airdried xylem fragments of textile or cellulosic plants, and to subject these fragments to mechanical pressing (3) in order to break down the macroscopic structure and to destroy vessels and medullary rays. Described are industrial plants for carrying out the process, possible shapes of the product (4) obtained and examples of the uses thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01B 1/14; C10L 5/48; D21B 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 5/48 (2006.01); D01B 1/14 (2006.01); D21B 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01B 1/14 (2013.01); C10L 5/48 (2013.01); D21B 1/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9601337 A1 19960118; AT 196933 T 20001015; AU 2752495 A 19960125; DE 69519095 D1 20001116; DE 69519095 T2 20010215; EP 0770151 A1 19970502; EP 0770151 B1 20001011; ES 2153038 T3 20010216; IT 1272317 B 19970616; IT RM940436 A1 19960102; IT RM940436 D0 19940701; PT 770151 E 20010131

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030711

2003-04-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-03-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2003-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-12-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-06-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020624

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010628

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010628

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-06-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010622

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-06-15 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20010615

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153038 T3

2001-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-11-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69519095 20001116

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR PT

2000-10-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196933 T 20001015

1999-01-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981125

1997-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970111

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR PT