Global Patent Index - EP 0770160 B1

EP 0770160 B1 2001-05-30 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE REPAIR OF BRIDGE JOINTS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE REPAIR OF BRIDGE JOINTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE REPARATUR VON BRÜCKENFUGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA REPARATION DES JOINTS DE PONT

Publication

EP 0770160 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95925226 A

Priority

  • SE 9500834 W
  • SE 9402395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9601342A1] In a device in connection with repair of bridge joints, wherein damaged material (5), at least in the area of the upper part of the joint, is to be removed by tearing up or the like, said device comprises an elongate sealing means (7) having such a width that it is insertable into an essentially horizontal position inside a bridge joint slot (4), wherein said elongate means (7) comprises sealing means (13) for achieving at least mainly sealing against torn up material falling down into the joint slot (4), and wherein the device comprises support means (9, 10, 11, 12) for securing in the essential horizontal position within the bridge joint slot. The invention also concerns a method in connection with repair of bridge joint as well as a bridge joint comprising such a device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01D 19/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 22/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01D 22/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9601342 A1 19960118; AT 201730 T 20010615; AU 2942295 A 19960125; DE 69521131 D1 20010705; EP 0770160 A1 19970502; EP 0770160 B1 20010530; SE 502873 C2 19960205; SE 9402395 D0 19940706; SE 9402395 L 19960107

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-08-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69521131 20010705

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201730 T 20010615

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981218

1997-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970131

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL