Global Patent Index - EP 0770230 B1

EP 0770230 B1 2000-08-23 - IMAGE-RECEIVING FILM FOR ELECTROGRAPHY

Title (en)

IMAGE-RECEIVING FILM FOR ELECTROGRAPHY

Title (de)

BILDEMPFANGSFILM FÜR ELEKTROGRAPHIE

Title (fr)

FILM POUR RECEPTION D'IMAGE PAR PROCEDE ELECTROGRAPHIQUE

Publication

EP 0770230 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95923710 A

Priority

  • JP 15725294 A
  • US 9507112 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9602023A1] To provide an image-receiving film for electrography which can prevent the occurrence of an oil pooling phenomenon and, at the same time, can enhance oil retention and reduce oiliness to the touch. An image-receiving film for electrography, comprising a transparent substrate and an image-receiving layer provided on at least one surface of said substrate, wherein the image-receiving layer comprises a transparent image-forming resin and, added thereto, 0.1 to 100 parts by weight, based on 100 parts by weight of said image-formable resin, of porous silica having a surface area of not less than 350 m<2>/g and an average particle diameter in the range of from 0.05 to 100 mu m and/or polysiloxane particles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 7/0026 (2013.01); G03G 7/0013 (2013.01); G03G 7/0046 (2013.01); G03G 7/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9602023 A1 19960125; AU 2817195 A 19960209; CA 2194455 A1 19960125; CN 1152359 A 19970618; DE 69518523 D1 20000928; DE 69518523 T2 20010419; EP 0770230 A1 19970502; EP 0770230 B1 20000823; JP H0830010 A 19960202

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050602

2006-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060101

2006-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2006-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060101

2005-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050603

2005-06-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-06-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050602

2004-08-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040802

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040621

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040621

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040618

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-05-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040526

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-05-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040517

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PORTA CHECCACCI & ASSOCIATI S.P.A.

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69518523 20000928

2000-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-07-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980520

1997-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970203

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE