Global Patent Index - EP 0770274 B1

EP 0770274 B1 2000-07-26 - PLUG CONNECTOR HOUSING

Title (en)

PLUG CONNECTOR HOUSING

Title (de)

STECKVERBINDUNGSGEHÄUSE

Title (fr)

BOITIER DE CONNECTEUR A FICHES

Publication

EP 0770274 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96913443 A

Priority

  • DE 9600746 W
  • DE 19517431 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19517431C1] The one-piece plug connection housing (60) consisting of at least three mutually engageable housing sections (10, 20, 30) pivotably connected together by film hinges (21, 31) is designed to accept electric conductors (40, 45) with contacts (42, 47) fitted to them and lying in several planes (22), in which the upper housing section (30) is engaged with the lower section (10) in the closed position and thus locks the other folded housing sections (20') between them. To reduce the space required and to simplify fabrication, the number of mutually engageable housing sections (10, 20, 30) exceeds that of the planes (22) in the seam regions (62) between the closed housing sections (10, 20', 30'), in which the electric conductors (40, 45) lie when fitted, by 1, whereby electric conductors (40, 45), especially with identical electric contacts (47), are locked in a seam region (62) and the film hinges (21) between the lower housing section (10) and the intermediate housing sections (20) are arranged at right angles to the film hinges (31) between the lower (10) and upper (30) housing sections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/422

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/436 (2006.01); H01R 13/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/436 (2013.01); H01R 13/501 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19517431 C1 19960627; EP 0770274 A1 19970502; EP 0770274 B1 20000726; ES 2148756 T3 20001016; WO 9636092 A1 19961114

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040503

2005-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-05-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040503

2003-05-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030424

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030415

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010321

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-11-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148756 T3

2000-09-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000822

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605641 20000831

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990208

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970514

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT