Global Patent Index - EP 0770338 B1

EP 0770338 B1 2002-09-25 - Cap body of a helmet

Title (en)

Cap body of a helmet

Title (de)

Den Kopf bedeckender Körper eines Helmes

Title (fr)

Corps coiffant de casque

Publication

EP 0770338 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96307674 A

Priority

  • JP 27458995 A
  • JP 27459095 A
  • JP 19377896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0770338A1] In a cap body (1) of a helmet (H) comprised of a shell (4) and a liner (7), the liner (7) includes an outer liner (7a) made of a low expanded synthetic resin and having an excellent external force dispersing function, and an inner liner (7b) made of a high expanded synthetic resin and having an excellent external force absorbing function, said inner liner (7b) being fitted to an inner surface of said outer liner (7a). Thus, the shock damping performance of the cap body (1) can be enhanced without specially increasing the thickness of the liner (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A42B 3/12; A42B 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/06 (2006.01); A42B 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/128 (2013.01); A42B 3/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0770338 A1 19970502; EP 0770338 B1 20020925; DE 69623901 D1 20021031; DE 69623901 T2 20030123

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-08-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021225

2003-07-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-06-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2002-12-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021225

2002-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69623901 20021031

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-25 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990914

1997-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970609

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI