Global Patent Index - EP 0770440 B1

EP 0770440 B1 2000-03-29 - Ladle for holding hot molten casting material and an edge brick for this ladle

Title (en)

Ladle for holding hot molten casting material and an edge brick for this ladle

Title (de)

Pfanne zum Aufnehmen von heissem, flüssigem Gussmaterial und für diese Pfanne bestimmter Randstein

Title (fr)

Poche destinée à recevoir un matériau de coulée liquide chaud et brique de bord pour cette poche

Publication

EP 0770440 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96110179 A

Priority

DE 29516873 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0770440A1] An edge piece (6) made of fireproof material engages over the edge, at least in the pour-out area of the edge (4) of the crucible or cauldron. The edge piece completely covers the face side of the cauldron edge, and has an inner arm (8), which extends along the inside of the cauldron wall (2). The cross-sectional thickness of the inner arm corresponds approximately to the cross-sectional thickness of the permanent lining layer (9) of the inner lining (3). The inner arm abuts on the face side of the permanent lining. The edge piece on the inside is covered at least area-wise by a work lining (10). The edge piece has an outer arm (11), which overlaps the outside of the cauldron wall.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 41/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29516873 U1 19951214; AT 191165 T 20000415; EP 0770440 A1 19970502; EP 0770440 B1 20000329

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59604825

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100625

2011-10-13 [REG DE R040] WITHDRAWAL/REFUSAL OF REVOCATION ACTION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59604825

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-05 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 59604825

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090624

2011-02-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090624

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090624

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090624

2009-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BECK U. KALTHEUNER FEUERFESTE ERZEUGNISSE G.M.B.H

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090610

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080701

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080624

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604825 20000504

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FR GB IT LU NL SE

2000-03-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191165 T 20000415

1998-09-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980731

1997-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971028

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FR GB IT LU NL SE