Global patent index - EP 0770457 B1

EP 0770457 B1 2001-01-03 - Grinding wheel

Title (en)

Grinding wheel

Title (de)

Schleifscheibe

Title (fr)

Meule

Publication

EP 0770457 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95116805 A

Priority

EP 95116805 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0770457A1] A number of pyramidal or truncated-pyramidal projections (50) are formed on a portion of a metal base (1) forming a grinding face, to be homogeneously distributed at substantially uniform heights. Super abrasive grains (8) having grain sizes which are smaller than the heights of the projections are fixed to the surfaces of the projections (50). A coating film (10) consisting of fluororesin is formed to at least partially cover the outer surface of the grinding face (2) including the surfaces of the super abrasive grains (8), for preventing deposition of a workpiece. Since the outer surface of the grinding face (2) is covered with the coating film (10), sharpness of this grinding wheel is improved and clearances between the super abrasive grains are hardly clogged up with chips, while the chips are hardly deposited onto the grinding face. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 3/34; B24D 3/28; B24D 18/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 3/28 (2006.01); B24D 3/34 (2006.01); B24D 18/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 3/344 (2013.01); B24D 3/28 (2013.01); B24D 18/0018 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0770457 A1 19970502; EP 0770457 B1 20010103; DE 69519800 D1 20010208; DE 69519800 T2 20010802

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071025

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-12-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051019

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69519800

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-08

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1998-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971118

1997-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960731

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT