Global Patent Index - EP 0770476 B1

EP 0770476 B1 2002-12-11 - Apparatus for spreading open tubular blanks for making bottoms in bags

Title (en)

Apparatus for spreading open tubular blanks for making bottoms in bags

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Aufziehen von Schlauchabschnitten zum Zweck der Anformung von Böden bei der Sackherstellung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la mise en volume d'une gaine tubulaire aplatie

Publication

EP 0770476 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96113141 A

Priority

DE 19540150 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0770476A2] Hose pieces (1) made of single or multilayer paper are conveyed in a crossways plane (3) so that their ends to be drawn up and having straight cut edges extend over guide or limiting edges. Rows of suckers (4) engage on the walls of the hose section. The ends of the hose sections formed by the cut edges are drawn upwards and the folding of the drawn-up base square is stabilised. The suckers of both rows are directed towards each other and are fixed radially on support tubes (7), which are articulately connected to two parallel links (8,9) rotatable around pivot shafts (10,11) in the machine frame. A crank (12) is fixed on the shaft of the first parallel link, which at its free end carries a roller (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 1/80; B31B 37/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/30 (2006.01); B25J 15/06 (2006.01); B31B 1/80 (2006.01); B31B 29/00 (2006.01); B31B 35/00 (2006.01); B31B 37/00 (2006.01); B31B 37/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31B 70/00 (2017.08); B31B 70/003 (2017.08); B31B 2150/00 (2017.08); B31B 2150/0014 (2017.08); B31B 2160/10 (2017.08); B31B 2160/20 (2017.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0770476 A2 19970502; EP 0770476 A3 19990203; EP 0770476 B1 20021211; AT 229432 T 20021215; BR 9605263 A 19980721; CN 1071627 C 20010926; CN 1154907 A 19970723; CZ 292575 B6 20031015; CZ 9602473 A3 19970514; DE 19549618 C2 20010906; ES 2188699 T3 20030701; IN 191462 B 20031206; JP 3699218 B2 20050928; JP H09202311 A 19970805; KR 100208894 B1 19990715; TW 391924 B 20000601; US 5827165 A 19981027

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160817

2016-11-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161125

2016-10-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 229432 T

- Effective date: 20160816

2016-08-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59609966

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150825

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150826

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150831

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090816

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090816

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080826

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080822

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188699 T3

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030329

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609966 20030123

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229432 T 20021215

2000-05-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000410

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990803

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT