Global patent index - EP 0770493 B1

EP 0770493 B1 2000-01-12 - Support and ink jet recording material containing the same

Title (en)

Support and ink jet recording material containing the same

Title (de)

Träger und Tintenstrahlaufzeichungsmaterial, das diesen Träger enthält

Title (fr)

Support et matériau pour l'enregistrement par jet d'encre contenant ce support

Publication

EP 0770493 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96117019 A

Priority

JP 27580895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0770493A1] A support for an ink jet recording material, having an enhanced gloss, revolution and image sharpness and clarity, includes a substrate sheet and a radiation-cured resin coating layer formed on a surface of the substrate sheet, and the ink jet recording material prepared by forming an ink-receiving layer on the support sheet can form thereon ink images having an enhanced sharpness and clarity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/00; D21H 19/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/50 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01); D21H 19/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/5209 (2013.01); B41M 5/506 (2013.01); B41M 5/508 (2013.01); B41M 5/5218 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0770493 A1 19970502; EP 0770493 B1 20000112; DE 69606138 D1 20000217; DE 69606138 T2 20000928; JP H09119093 A 19970506

INPADOC legal status

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091023

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081016

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69606138

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000217

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-09-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980724

1997-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970630

1997-05-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: IKEZAWA, HIDEO

1997-05-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NAGASAKI, SHINICHI

1997-05-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NEMOTO, HIROYUKI

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB