Global Patent Index - EP 0770494 B1

EP 0770494 B1 2000-05-24 - A method for making a lithographic printing plate involving on press development

Title (en)

A method for making a lithographic printing plate involving on press development

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer lithographische Druckplatte mit auf der Druckpresse stattfindenden Entwicklung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'une plaque lithographique avec développement sur presse

Publication

EP 0770494 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95202874 A

Priority

EP 95202874 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0770494A2] The present invention provides a method for making a lithographic printing plate comprising the steps of: (1) image-wise exposing to light an imaging element comprising (i) on a hydrophilic surface of a lithographic base an image forming layer comprising hydrophobic thermoplastic polymer particles dispersed in a hydrophilic binder and (ii) a compound capable of converting light to heat, said compound being comprised in said image forming layer or a layer adjacent thereto; (2) and developing a thus obtained image-wise exposed imaging element by mounting it on a print cylinder of a printing press and supplying an aqueous dampening liquid and/or ink to said image forming layer while rotating said print cylinder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/36; B41C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/004 (2006.01); B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41M 5/36 (2006.01); B41N 1/14 (2006.01); B41N 3/08 (2006.01); G03F 7/00 (2006.01); G03F 7/016 (2006.01); G03F 7/038 (2006.01); G03F 7/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/366 (2013.01); B41C 1/1025 (2013.01); B41C 2210/04 (2013.01); B41C 2210/08 (2013.01); B41C 2210/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0770494 A2 19970502; EP 0770494 A3 19970507; EP 0770494 B1 20000524; DE 69517174 D1 20000629; DE 69517174 T2 20001109; JP 2938397 B2 19990823; JP H09123387 A 19970513

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151023

2015-11-18 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20151023

2015-10-28 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK

- Effective date: 20151023

2015-10-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69517174

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140829

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140605 AND 20140611

2014-05-02 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: AGFA GRAPHICS NV, BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

- Effective date: 20140328

2014-05-02 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

- Effective date: 20140328

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69517174

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140314

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (N.D.GES.D. STAATES DELA, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69517174

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140314

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (N.D.GES.D. STAATES DELA, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69517174

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140314

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69517174

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140314

2014-04-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69517174

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

- Effective date: 20140314

2014-03-19 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20140312

2014-03-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69517174

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

2012-05-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69517174

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-05-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (N.D.GES.D. STAATES DELA, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69517174

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120403

2010-07-09 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

2010-04-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100401 AND 20100407

2010-01-04 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20091028

2010-01-04 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: PAKON, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20091028

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *AGFA-GEVAERT N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041031

2007-06-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20070321

2007-03-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *AGFA-GEVAERT N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2003-08-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030828

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69517174

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-29

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1998-05-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980408

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971107

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL