Global Patent Index - EP 0770532 B1

EP 0770532 B1 2000-05-17 - Disengageable ropeway with driving module

Title (en)

Disengageable ropeway with driving module

Title (de)

Kuppelbare Seilschwebebahn mit Antriebsmodul

Title (fr)

Téléporteur débrayable à module de prise de mouvement

Publication

EP 0770532 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96410108 A

Priority

FR 9512680 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0770532A1] The cable car friction drive wheels (10) are spaced at regular intervals on a support beam (20) located above a station transfer rail. The cable car is coupled to a cable (12) from which it is uncoupled at entry to the station to run on rollers along the transfer rail. The cable movement, continuing to drive the friction wheels on the transfer rail, is maintained and driven by a module (19) on a cable support roller (17). The module is arranged as a caisson (21) inserted in the wheel train support beam. It comprises two axles (23,28) connected by gearing. One of the axles carries a friction wheel and the other a transmission pulley (29) for the belt transmission to the cable support.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 12/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02G 1/02 (2006.01); B61B 12/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/105 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH ES IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0770532 A1 19970502; EP 0770532 B1 20000517; AT 192983 T 20000615; CA 2188586 A1 19970426; ES 2146373 T3 20000801; FR 2740417 A1 19970430; FR 2740417 B1 19980102; JP H09215140 A 19970815; US 5690031 A 19971125

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051021

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011022

2001-10-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011021

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20001030

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20001030

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-10-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20001023

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146373 T3

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES IT LI

2000-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192983 T 20000615

2000-05-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: INTERPATENT ST.TECN. BREV.

1998-12-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981026

1997-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970822

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES IT LI