Global Patent Index - EP 0770637 B1

EP 0770637 B1 2002-09-11 - Process for making a polyphenylene ether resin molding material for lamp reflectors

Title (en)

Process for making a polyphenylene ether resin molding material for lamp reflectors

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Polyphenylenetherharz-Formmasse für Lampenreflektoren

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la préparation d'une masse à mouler à la base de polyphénylène éther pour des réflecteurs pour lampes

Publication

EP 0770637 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96307387 A

Priority

JP 30051095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0770637A1] A resin composition for lamp reflectors with excellent heat resistance, beam sharpness, and mechanical properties comprises 80-100 percent by weight of polyphenylene ether as the resin component. The composition has a heat deflection temperature of at least 160 DEG C, and the resin component, when dissolved in chloroform, leaves a residue of no more than 0.05 percent by weight when passed through a 325 mesh screen. The molding material can be made by, for example, maintaining the resin component at a temperature of no more than 360 DEG C while melt-kneading it at a specific energy of at least 0.5 kwh/kg.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08G 65/40; C08L 71/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/10 (2006.01); C08L 71/12 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08L 71/123 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08L 71/123 + C08L 2666/04

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0770637 A1 19970502; EP 0770637 B1 20020911; DE 69623560 D1 20021017; DE 69623560 T2 20030515; ES 2182953 T3 20030316; JP H1160935 A 19990305

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071010

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061010

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061010

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051130

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051005

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031011

2004-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-10-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031011

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182953 T3

2002-11-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021106

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69623560 20021017

2002-10-11 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20021011

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR MAKING A POLYPHENYLENE ETHER RESIN MOLDING MATERIAL FOR LAMP REFLECTORS

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990223

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971103

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL