Global Patent Index - EP 0770740 B1

EP 0770740 B1 2000-08-30 - Roofing tile

Title (en)

Roofing tile

Title (de)

Falzziegel

Title (fr)

Tuile

Publication

EP 0770740 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96117195 A

Priority

DE 29517074 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0770740A1] The tile has a side groove and a head groove, and the latter has a dip at the corner which opens towards the head of the tile. The dip is part of a recess, which is countersunk into the outer rib of the head groove, and or which is open towards the left edge of the tile. A hook shaped rib (227) is arranged on the rear side of the tile, in the outer head region, and this merges into a water conducting rib (621). On laying, the latter lies in the outer rib recess, which is blocked at one end.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29517074 U1 19970227; AT 195991 T 20000915; EP 0770740 A1 19970502; EP 0770740 B1 20000830

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151025

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 195991 T

- Effective date: 20151025

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605817

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140925

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-01-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59605817

- Representative's name: MAMMEL UND MASER, PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080501

2006-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051025

2004-10-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041026

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-26 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-10-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605817 20001005

2000-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI NL

2000-08-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195991 T 20000915

1999-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991022

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970905

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI NL