Global Patent Index - EP 0770751 B1

EP 0770751 B1 2000-06-21 - Device for holding a wing ajar

Title (en)

Device for holding a wing ajar

Title (de)

Anlage um einen Flügel angelehnt zu halten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de maintien d'un ouvrant dans une position entrebâillée

Publication

EP 0770751 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96440080 A

Priority

FR 9512903 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0770751A1] The lock fitting for a door comprises a locking bolt consisting of an operating rod extending on a door rabbet. It is displaced by a drive mechanism activated by a control handle or key cylinder (12). The door is held ajar by a support (23), fixed on the door frame, on which is pivoted one (25) of the ends of a compass arm (26). The opposite end (27) of the compass arm has a guide pin (29) or a roller. This pin slides inside a strike plate (30) in a support (31) which is fixed to displace with the operating rod placed on the door. This limits the opening angle of the door relative to the door frame. The fastener disengages from the strike plate following displacement of the operating rod, acted on by the handle, consequent to it opening the door wider.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 17/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0770751 A1 19970502; EP 0770751 B1 20000621; AT 194024 T 20000715; DE 69608942 D1 20000727; DE 69608942 T2 20010201; ES 2149441 T3 20001101; FR 2740504 A1 19970430; FR 2740504 B1 19980227; GR 3034386 T3 20001229; PT 770751 E 20001130

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-14 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050723

2004-06-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031112

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021009

2003-05-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG.

- Effective date: 20010320

2002-12-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021220

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-10-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. FERCO INTERNATIONAL FERRURES ET SERRURES DE

- Effective date: 20011031

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20011026

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-25 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20011025

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011010

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-09 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20011009

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SIEGENIA-FRANK KG

2001-05-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIEGENIA-FRANK KG

- Effective date: 20010320

2000-12-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20001214

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2149441 T3

2000-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20001031

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-10-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20001026

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-09-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-09-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608942 20000727

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR LI NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194024 T 20000715

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990519

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970920

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR LI NL PT SE