Global Patent Index - EP 0770753 B1

EP 0770753 B1 2000-04-05 - Wing-side corner hinge for the corner support of a tilt-and-turn window, door or the like

Title (en)

Wing-side corner hinge for the corner support of a tilt-and-turn window, door or the like

Title (de)

Flügel-Eckband für das Ecklager eines Drehkippfensters, einer Tür od. dgl.

Title (fr)

Charnière d'angle à côté battant pour palier d'angle d'une fenêtre, porte ou similaire, pivotante et basculante

Publication

EP 0770753 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96112295 A

Priority

  • DE 29516888 U
  • DE 29519344 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0770753A1] The free ends of both arms (6,15) of the corner angle (4), each with a support frame (9,20), engage in locked engagement in the pane or panel rabbet peripheral surface, e.g. in the fixture groove. The corner angle, at least on its arm parallel to the bearing casing (2), is provided with an eccentrically rotatable support member (25). For the support member on the pane or panel, e.g. locating in the fixture groove, buttresses are provided. The corner angle with the aid of the support member is elastically tensionable relatively to the support frames and in relation to the pane or panel corner crossways to the pane or panel plane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/5214 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0770753 A1 19970502; EP 0770753 B1 20000405; AT 191535 T 20000415; CZ 291797 B6 20030514; CZ 9603112 A3 19980513; DK 0770753 T3 20000710; ES 2145353 T3 20000701; HU 219558 B 20010528; HU 9602294 A1 19971028; HU 9602294 D0 19961028; PL 180907 B1 20010430; PL 316324 A1 19970428; SK 137296 A3 19970709; SK 284133 B6 20040908; TR 9600828 A2 19970521

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150730

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150730

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150730

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150730

2016-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 191535 T

- Effective date: 20150730

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604874

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140718

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140717

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140717

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140731

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEGENIA-FRANK K.G.

- Effective date: 20040731

2005-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040731

2005-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-07 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-03-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEGENIA-FRANK K.G.

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-08-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040730

2003-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030724

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030718

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-17 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030717

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-16 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030716

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-16 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030716

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-04 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030704

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145353 T3

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604874 20000511

2000-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE GEORG ROEMPLER UND ALDO ROEMPLER

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19960730;SI PAYMENT 19960730

2000-04-05 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2000-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191535 T 20000415

1999-12-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990225

1997-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970602

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1997-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 960730;SI PAYMENT 960730