Global patent index - EP 0770796 B1

EP 0770796 B1 2000-04-12 - One-way clutch

Title (en)

One-way clutch

Title (de)

Freilaufkupplung

Title (fr)

Accouplement unidirectionnel

Publication

EP 0770796 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96116987 A

Priority

  • JP 30389495 A
  • JP 30523595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0770796A1] The present invention is intended to provide a one-way clutch capable of preventing the inner circumferential surface of the outer ring of the one-way clutch from being deformed even when the outer ring of the one-way clutch for a stator constituting a torque converter is integrally formed with the stator made of plastic. To attain the object, in the one-way clutch for the plastic stator, wherein the bearing support portion of the stator is integrally formed in the inner circumferential direction at or near one axial end of the boss portion of the stator and the outer ring is inserted in and formed on the inner circumferential side of the boss portion so as to be integrally held, the thickness of the outer ring on the side opposite to the bearing support portion is made smaller than that on the side of the bearing support portion, or the outer diameter of the outer ring is gradually decreased in the axial direction from the end of the outer ring on the side of the bearing support portion to the other end, or a ring-shaped step portion is provided at the other axial end on the outer circumferential surface of the outer ring so that the amount of thermal shrinkage at the plastic portion on the side of the bearing support portion of the stator is made almost equal to the thermal shrinkage at the plastic portion on the opposite side. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16H 41/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16H 41/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16H 41/24 (2013.01); F16H 2041/246 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0770796 A1 19970502; EP 0770796 B1 20000412; DE 69607721 D1 20000518; DE 69607721 T2 20010111; US 5760514 A 19980602

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051011

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061022

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20061022

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2005-12-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051019

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051011

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69607721

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-18

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990324

1997-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970604

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB