Global Patent Index - EP 0770809 B1

EP 0770809 B1 2001-04-11 - Coupling for hose and method of manufacturing the same

Title (en)

Coupling for hose and method of manufacturing the same

Title (de)

Schlauchkupplung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Raccord pour tuyau flexible et procédé pour le fabriquer

Publication

EP 0770809 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96116957 A

Priority

JP 27583595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0770809A1] A coupling for coupling hoses comprising a pair of coupling main bodies (1a, 1b) that are structurally identical and undiscriminable for male and female. Each of said coupling main bodies (1a, 1b) is provided at the front end surface with a sealing surface (6) for mutual abutment and at the front end with a plurality of engaging projections (8) and engaging recesses (7), each of said engaging recesses (7) being arranged between any two adjacent engaging projections (8), so that the engaging projections (8) and the engaging recesses (7) of the two coupling main bodies (1a, 1b) can be complementarily engaged with the corresponding engaging projections (8) and engaging recesses (7) of the other coupling main bodies (1b, 1a). The engaging projections (8) are provided with respective hooked anchor sections (9) that are peripherally engaged to restrict axial movement and consequently couple the pair of coupling main bodies (1a, 1b). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16L 37/252

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16L 37/24 (2006.01); F16L 37/252 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16L 37/252 (2013.01); Y10S 285/906 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0770809 A1 19970502; EP 0770809 B1 20010411; AT 200565 T 20010415; CA 2188520 A1 19970425; CA 2188520 C 20050823; CN 1083552 C 20020424; CN 1159527 A 19970917; DE 69612456 D1 20010517; DE 69612456 T2 20010726; DK 0770809 T3 20010507; ES 2158210 T3 20010901; GR 3035746 T3 20010731; JP 3107507 B2 20001113; JP H09119577 A 19970506; PT 770809 E 20010731; US 5857713 A 19990112

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161023

2017-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-02-02 [REG GR MA] RIGHT EXPIRED

- Document: GR 20010400574

- Effective date: 20161023

2017-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161022

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161021

2017-01-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170127

2016-12-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 200565 T

- Effective date: 20161022

2016-11-30 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2016-11-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-11-16 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161021

2016-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-10-28 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20161021

2016-10-24 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20161022

2016-10-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69612456

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151029

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151019

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151102

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150910

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20151019

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151009

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20151012

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20150907

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150904

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150904

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150916

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150918

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SAKURA RUBBER CO., LTD.

- Free text: SAKURA RUBBER CO., LTD.#1-21-17, SASAZUKA, SHIBUYA-KU#TOKYO (JP) -TRANSFER TO- SAKURA RUBBER CO., LTD.#1-21-17, SASAZUKA, SHIBUYA-KU#TOKYO (JP)

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011022

2001-10-22 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011022

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158210 T3

2001-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-06-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2001-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612456 20010517

2001-05-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-05-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-12 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200565 T 20010415

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991111

1997-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971016

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE