Global Patent Index - EP 0770927 B1

EP 0770927 B1 2001-04-11 - Transfer sheet for electrophotography

Title (en)

Transfer sheet for electrophotography

Title (de)

Übertragungsblatt für die Elektrophotographie

Title (fr)

Feuille de transfer pour électrophotographie

Publication

EP 0770927 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96116796 A

Priority

JP 27220095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0770927A1] A transfer sheet for electrophotography is disclosed. The transfer sheet comprises a sheet substrate and a porous resin-containing coated layer formed on at least one surface of the substrate. The coated layer has a surface average pore diameter of 0.5 to 50 mu m, having a surface pore opening area ratio of at 10 to 70%, and having a density of 0.1 to 0.8 g/cm<3>. The transfer sheet eliminates disturbance of mottles and dots in the image portion and provides a high quality picture image small in gloss contrast between the blank portion and the image portion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 7/0006 (2013.01); G03G 7/0026 (2013.01); G03G 7/0033 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24802 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24992 (2013.01); Y10T 428/249953 (2015.04); Y10T 428/249956 (2015.04); Y10T 428/249958 (2015.04); Y10T 428/249976 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0770927 A1 19970502; EP 0770927 B1 20010411; DE 69612458 D1 20010517; DE 69612458 T2 20011122; US 5759672 A 19980602; US 5965315 A 19991012

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081018

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20081018

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071017

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071011

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69612458

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-17

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1998-09-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980721

1997-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970527

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB