Global patent index - EP 0770937 B1

EP 0770937 B1 2000-01-26 - Timepiece provided with a rotatable bezel

Title (en)

Timepiece provided with a rotatable bezel

Title (de)

Uhr mit einem drehbaren Ring

Title (fr)

Pièce d'horlogerie comportant une lunette tournante

Publication

EP 0770937 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96116304 A

Priority

  • CH 303595 A
  • EP 96101321 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0770937A1] The watch has a box (2) with bottom (6) and shoulder (4) which contains the mechanism (10) and also a dial (12) and watch glass (8). An oversleeve (22) is fixed to a rebate in the shoulder (4) by a lower lip (24). A sight glass rim (36) has an internal annular slot (44) which engages with a split ring (60) which is housed in the outer face of the oversleeve (22). The sight glass rim has teeth (42) which cooperate with sprung pawls on a ring (54) fixed to the glass (8) to control rim movement. The assembly is completed by a sealing ring (52).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 19/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/283 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0770937 A1 19970502; EP 0770937 B1 20000126; DE 69606374 D1 20000302; DE 69606374 T2 20000824; HK 1013340 A1 20000804

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140924

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071011

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061011

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061011

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BOTTI & FERRARI S.R.L.

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69606374

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000302

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-09-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980812

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971103

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT