Global Patent Index - EP 0770938 B1

EP 0770938 B1 2000-02-16 - Timepiece with means for positioning a movement in a case and case for such a timepiece

Title (en)

Timepiece with means for positioning a movement in a case and case for such a timepiece

Title (de)

Uhr mit Positioniermitteln für das Uhrwerk im Gehäuse und zur Ausrüstung einer solchen Uhr bestimmtes Gehäuse

Title (fr)

Pièce d'horlogerie ayant des moyens de positionnement d'un mouvement dans une boîte, et boîte destinée à équiper une telle pièce

Publication

EP 0770938 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96116546 A

Priority

  • EP 96116546 A
  • CH 303495 A
  • EP 96101320 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0770938A1] A box (2) with bottom (6) and shoulder (4) houses a movement (12) contained in a case (14). The upper part of the case (14a) has a peripheral shoulder with a horizontal face (25) which lays against another face (26) formed in the internal wall of the of the box shoulder (4) to provide axial location. The metal box (2) has a projecting metal stud (36) formed in the upper surface of its bottom (6) and the watch case (14) has an orifice (38) in it's plastic lower surface (14b) . These two elements are both small in relation to the box (2) and provide accurate lateral location.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 37/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 37/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 37/05 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0770938 A1 19970502; EP 0770938 B1 20000216

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-10-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69606678

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071016

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061016

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061016

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-11 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

2000-07-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-13 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2000-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000428

2000-05-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BOTTI & FERRARI S.R.L.

2000-03-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606678 20000323

2000-02-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-09-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TIMEPIECE WITH MEANS FOR POSITIONING A MOVEMENT IN A CASE AND CASE FOR SUCH A TIMEPIECE

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981030

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971103

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI