Global Patent Index - EP 0771048 B1

EP 0771048 B1 2001-01-03 - Tube shaped shroud

Title (en)

Tube shaped shroud

Title (de)

Schlauchförmige Hülle

Title (fr)

Enveloppe tubulaire

Publication

EP 0771048 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96116862 A

Priority

  • DE 19539843 A
  • DE 19621830 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0771048A2] The sleeve (1) is fitted around the component whose leads (6) protrude from one end (2a). Both ends (2,2a) are tapered by having their edges folded (3,4) inwards before they are pressed together to secure the component. Preferably the sleeve is made of polyester or polyolefin with or without shrinkability. The folded portions have double thickness of material with consequently higher dielectric values. In an alternative embodiment for a component having a lead at each end, the two ends of the sleeve are folded and pressed in like manner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/72; H02G 15/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/72 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 2997411 A 19610822 - WOOLLEY HAROLD O

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0771048 A2 19970502; EP 0771048 A3 19981216; EP 0771048 B1 20010103; EP 0771048 B2 20050921; ES 2153928 T3 20010316; ES 2153928 T5 20060401

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-21 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606276

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131022

2014-11-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20141107

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121023

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-28 [REG DE R040] WITHDRAWAL/REFUSAL OF REVOCATION ACTION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59606276

- Effective date: 20110913

2011-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101021

2011-09-13 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 59606276

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110501

2011-08-03 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2011-05-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110501

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091027

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20091021

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-06-16 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2006-04-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2006-03-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2005-12-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20050921

2005-09-21 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20050921

2005-09-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IE IT NL

2002-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THERMIK GERAETEBAU GMBH

2001-11-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THERMIK GERAETEBAU GMBH

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-03-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153928 T3

2001-03-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606276 20010208

2001-02-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IE IT NL

2000-08-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TMC SENSORTECHNIK GMBH

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000517

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990608

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IE IT NL

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IE IT NL