Global Patent Index - EP 0771540 B1

EP 0771540 B1 2001-04-04 - Joint rod for a mounting for sitting and lying furniture

Title (en)

Joint rod for a mounting for sitting and lying furniture

Title (de)

Gelenkstange eines Hochstellbeschlages für Sitz- und Liegemöbel

Title (fr)

Tige d'articulation d'une ferrure pour meubles d'assise et de couchage

Publication

EP 0771540 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96112873 A

Priority

DE 29517205 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0771540A1] The rod comprises a tube with two fittings (12) at its ends for attaching to a piece of furniture. The tube can rotate about its longitudinal axis with the fittings. The tube and fittings are fixed using at least one locking washer (17) attached to each fitting. The washer has several radial, sprung tabs (18), which slope towards the end of the tube and bear against its wall to clamp the fitting in place. Each fitting preferably has a rotatable bearing bush (15) which engages the end of the tube, to which it is attached jointly with the spring washer by means of a rivet (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 17/38; A47C 17/04; E05D 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/0215 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29517205 U1 19960104; AT 200200 T 20010415; EP 0771540 A1 19970507; EP 0771540 B1 20010404

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050809

2003-06-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FRANKE G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020809

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-08-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010827

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010824

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010824

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010806

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010723

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010717

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606698

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-10

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-04-12 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

2001-04-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO INGG. FISCHETTI & WEBER

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200200

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000803

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970910

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI NL