Global Patent Index - EP 0771543 B1

EP 0771543 B1 2001-03-28 - Shower enclosure

Title (en)

Shower enclosure

Title (de)

Duschabtrennung

Title (fr)

Séparation pour douche

Publication

EP 0771543 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96112626 A

Priority

DE 29517574 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CZ288333B6] The invented shower enclosure consists of two attachment sections (4), which are attached to both a bathroom wall and to the shower basin (1) by their lower ends. A corner section (5) lower end is attached to the shower basin (1), too. Upper ends of the attachment sections (4) are coupled with the corner section (5) upper end by means of two joining sections (6). Within the region extending between the shower basin (1) and a bathroom tub (3) wall (2) there is arranged between one attachment section (4) and the corner section (5) a partition wall (8), which can be swiveled on the attachment section (4) in the direction away from the wall (2) inward the shower. Between the corner section (5) and another attachment section (4) there are rotatably mounted two door elements (7). The partition wall (8) and the corner section (5) are fitted each with a magnetic section (9). The partition wall (8) and the door elements (7) are made of a single panel of safety glass. Length of the partition wall (8) ensures in all cases a substantially great overlap of the wall (2) upper edge by the partition wall (8) bottom edge.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 4/00; A47K 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 4/00 (2006.01); A47K 3/30 (2006.01); A47K 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29517574 U1 19960104; AT 200016 T 20010415; CZ 288333 B6 20010516; CZ 9602342 A3 19970514; EP 0771543 A1 19970507; EP 0771543 B1 20010328; HU 9602508 A2 19970929; HU 9602508 A3 19980302; HU 9602508 D0 19961128; NO 964673 A 19970507; NO 964673 D0 19961105; PL 181166 B1 20010629; PL 315702 A1 19970512; SK 109596 A3 19970507; TR 9600824 A2 19970521

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-08-10 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160804

2016-08-05 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606661

2015-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150830

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150819

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150811

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150819

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090805

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090805

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090805

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080805

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080814

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070827

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-08-05 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010805

2001-07-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-06-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-06-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-06-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-06-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606661 20010503

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200016 T 20010415

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47K 4/00 A, 7A 47K 3/28 B

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981208

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970424

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE