Global Patent Index - EP 0771578 B1

EP 0771578 B1 2001-01-10 - Backpressure modulating cartridge for a respiratory mask

Title (en)

Backpressure modulating cartridge for a respiratory mask

Title (de)

Gegendruckregelkartusche für Atemmaske

Title (fr)

Cartouche modulatrice de contre-pression pour masque respiratoire

Publication

EP 0771578 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402315 A

Priority

  • FR 9512919 A
  • US 85414397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0771578A1] The cartridge has a body (2) which fits onto a respirator mask (6) and connects with the ambient medium via exhalation (13) and inhalation (22) valves. The body has two chambers (8,9) linked by a passage (10) which has a guide rod passing through it. One of the chambers is connected to the respirator mask and the other to the ambient atmosphere. The guide rod carries the mobile exhalation valve (13) with apertures (21), and the mobile inhalation valve which fits inside the passage and covers the apertures. Both valves are held under tension by coaxial spiral springs (14,23) on the guide rod which are held between the valves and stops (4,15). The guide rod is located concentrically in the housing, which has an inner annular rim defining the passage and acting as a stop for the exhalation valve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 18/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 18/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 18/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0771578 A1 19970507; EP 0771578 B1 20010110; DE 69611504 D1 20010215; DE 69611504 T2 20010510; DK 0771578 T3 20010430; FR 2740691 A1 19970509; FR 2740691 B1 19980109; US 5937857 A 19990817

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-06-25 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ETAT FRANCAIS REPRESENTE PAR LE DELEGUE GENERAL P

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-01-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070116

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2005-12-01 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20051201

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-07-12 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050712

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-04-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611504 20010215

2001-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.A.

2001-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK GB LI NL

1999-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991105

1997-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961114

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK GB LI NL