Global Patent Index - EP 0771593 B1

EP 0771593 B1 2001-12-12 - Method and device for uncovering and cleaning steel wire strands

Title (en)

Method and device for uncovering and cleaning steel wire strands

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Freilegen und Reinigen von Litzen aus Stahldrähten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour découvrir et nettoyer des torons de fils d'acier

Publication

EP 0771593 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96116542 A

Priority

DE 19540392 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0771593A2] The method involves passing the strand, from which sheathing has been removed, through an elastic seal (10). The strand is thus surrounded by a gland form, and flushing liquid is applied to it under pressure. Preferably, a tubular lance can be introduced, connected at one end (9) to a flushing line (23). The lance may be composed of at least two sections (7a,7b) connected together, possibly telescopically. A valve (20) may lie next to the seal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 3/04; B08B 1/00; E04C 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 1/00 (2006.01); B08B 3/04 (2006.01); E01D 19/16 (2006.01); E04C 5/08 (2006.01); E04G 21/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/04 (2013.01); B08B 1/00 (2013.01); E01D 19/16 (2013.01); E04C 5/08 (2013.01); E04G 21/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0771593 A2 19970507; EP 0771593 A3 19980218; EP 0771593 B1 20011212; AT 210509 T 20011215; DE 19540392 A1 19970507

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DYWIDAG-SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59608429

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130628

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111016

2013-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20121025

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 210509 T

- Effective date: 20111016

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111028

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100930

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-11-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-09-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DYWIDAG-SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL GMBH

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608429 20020124

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210509 T 20011215

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990209

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980210

1998-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR