Global Patent Index - EP 0771620 B1

EP 0771620 B1 2000-03-22 - Drilling and chiseling tool

Title (en)

Drilling and chiseling tool

Title (de)

Bohr- und Meisselgerät

Title (fr)

Outil de forage et de burinage

Publication

EP 0771620 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810426 A

Priority

DE 19540391 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0771620A1] The equipment has a striking mechanism (31) and an intermediate shaft (15) which are mounted with parallel axes in a gearbox housing (2). A bearing plate (28) acts as the seating for the mechanism and the shaft, and is connected to the housing so that it is able to be detached. The plate may form a seating position (30) for a bearing region of the mechanism which opposes the direction of drilling. It may also form a seating position (29) for a bearing region (26) of the intermediate shaft which faces towards the direction of drilling.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25D 11/12 (2006.01); B23B 45/16 (2006.01); B25D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 17/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IE LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0771620 A1 19970507; EP 0771620 B1 20000322; CN 1075411 C 20011128; CN 1151921 A 19970618; DE 19540391 A1 19970507; JP H09168978 A 19970630; US 5732782 A 19980331

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-26 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59604749

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150624

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-06-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090611

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090615

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-02-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040626

2005-02-08 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-02-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040627

2004-06-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040626

2003-07-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20021117

2003-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030625

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030604

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-07 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20021117

2003-04-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-06-26 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-22 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20010622

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BLACK & DECKER INC.

2001-02-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BLACK & DECKER INC.

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604749 20000427

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IE LI NL SE

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981203

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971107

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IE LI NL SE