Global Patent Index - EP 0771624 B1

EP 0771624 B1 2000-01-05 - Cutting device for webs of flat material

Title (en)

Cutting device for webs of flat material

Title (de)

Schneideinrichtung für Flachmaterialbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif de coupe pour matériau plat en bande

Publication

EP 0771624 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96117476 A

Priority

DE 19541104 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0771624A2] The cutting device has an input section (12), a cutting section (14) and a delivery section (16). The input section has a damping device (24) for damping the shock waves in the material web resulting from the cutting operation. The damping device is provided by a curved damping plate or damping sheet (26) which can pivot in response to the shock waves, for absorbing the shock wave energy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/08; B26F 1/38; B41F 13/02; B41F 13/60; B65H 23/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/38 (2006.01); B26D 7/08 (2006.01); B65H 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/0006 (2013.01); B26D 1/385 (2013.01); B26D 7/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0771624 A2 19970507; EP 0771624 A3 19980218; EP 0771624 B1 20000105; DE 19549432 A1 19970507; DE 19549432 C2 20020228

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041031

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2003-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031003

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030915

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604105 20000210

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981222

1998-04-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: METO INTERNATIONAL GMBH

1998-03-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980123

1998-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB