Global Patent Index - EP 0771650 B1

EP 0771650 B1 2000-03-08 - Safety device for a printing machine

Title (en)

Safety device for a printing machine

Title (de)

Bogenrotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Système de sécurité pour une machine d'impression

Publication

EP 0771650 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96116088 A

Priority

DE 19541159 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0771650A1] The printing machine has a washing unit (2) associated with a cylinder (4), and an adjacent drying unit (1) associated with a sheet-feeding cylinder (5). A suction device (7) extends between the drying and washing unit over the whole cylinder width. Cleaning fluid, aerosols and/or cleaning fluid vapour are extracted and passed via a line and suction air source to the atmosphere. Preferably, the suction device consists of a beam (10) with suction zones (8) having openings. The washing unit can be shielded by at least one partition plate (9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/00; B41F 23/04; B41F 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/04 (2006.01); B41F 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/044 (2013.01); B41F 35/00 (2013.01); B41P 2233/20 (2013.01); B41P 2235/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0771650 A1 19970507; EP 0771650 B1 20000308; AT 190270 T 20000315; DE 19541159 A1 19970507; DE 19541159 C2 19990107

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2006-10-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061023

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051008

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2003-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-06-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021008

2003-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2002-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021009

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021008

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010925

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010917

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010914

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN A.G.

- Effective date: 20001031

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001008

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604591 20000413

2000-03-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190270 T 20000315

1999-02-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1997-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971103

1997-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961023

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL