Global Patent Index - EP 0771708 B1

EP 0771708 B1 2000-04-19 - Actuating and locking mechanism for weather protection hoods on chairlifts

Title (en)

Actuating and locking mechanism for weather protection hoods on chairlifts

Title (de)

Betätigungs- und Verriegelungsmechanismus für Wetterschutzhauben von Sesselliften

Title (fr)

Mécanisme d'actionnement et de verrouillage pour capots protecteurs contre les intempéries de télésièges

Publication

EP 0771708 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810590 A

Priority

CH 306595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0771708A1] The actuation mechanism is for the hood over the chair of a ski-lift. It incorporates a double lever (4,5) which is rotatably linked at one end to the weather protection hood (2) and at the other end to the chair (1). The cable (3) engages one of the two levers of the double lever. The double lever takes up a position at the first stop or buffer (6) on the hand actuation of the hood. When it is actuated by the cable it is pressed against a third stop (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 12/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/002 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

AT 244693 B 19660125 - VOEST AG

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0771708 A1 19970507; EP 0771708 B1 20000419; AT 191890 T 20000515; DE 59604994 D1 20000525

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 191890 T

- Effective date: 20160909

2016-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150916

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2001-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604994 20000525

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-04-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191890 T 20000515

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990120

1997-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970916

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI