Global Patent Index - EP 0771715 B1

EP 0771715 B1 2000-03-22 - Combination printer and cutting device for webs of flat material

Title (en)

Combination printer and cutting device for webs of flat material

Title (de)

Kombination aus einer Druckeinheit und einer Schneideinrichtung für eine Flachmaterialbahn

Title (fr)

Combination d'une unité d'impression et d'un dispositif de coupe pour matériau plat en bande

Publication

EP 0771715 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96117477 A

Priority

  • EP 96117477 A
  • DE 19541104 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0771715A2] The cutting device has an input section (12), a cutting section (14) and a delivery section (16). The input section has a damping device (24) for damping the shock waves in the material web resulting from the cutting operation. The damping device is provided by a curved damping plate or damping sheet (26) which can pivot in response to the shock waves, for absorbing the shock wave energy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/00; B26D 1/38; B41F 13/60; B41J 29/02; B65H 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/38 (2006.01); B26D 7/08 (2006.01); B65H 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/0006 (2013.01); B26D 1/385 (2013.01); B26D 7/08 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0645297 A1 19950329 - T T S S R L TECNO TROLLEY SYST [IT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0771715 A2 19970507; EP 0771715 A3 19980304; EP 0771715 B1 20000322

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2004-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-20 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-08-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604750 20000427

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

1999-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6B 26D 7/00 A, 6B 41F 13/60 B, 6B 41J 29/02 B, 6B 26D 1/38 B, 6B 65H 35/00 B

1999-08-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COMBINATION PRINTER AND CUTTING DEVICE FOR WEBS OF FLAT MATERIAL

1999-08-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6B 26D 7/00 A, 6B 41F 13/60 B, 6B 41J 29/02 B, 6B 26D 1/38 B, 6B 65H 35/00 B

1999-08-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COMBINATION PRINTER AND CUTTING DEVICE FOR WEBS OF FLAT MATERIAL

1998-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981104

1998-04-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METO INTERNATIONAL GMBH

1998-03-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980123

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-02-25 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B26D 7/00

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB