Global Patent Index - EP 0771733 B1

EP 0771733 B1 2001-05-09 - Device for transferring labels from a rotary driven first cylinder to a rotary driven second cylinder

Title (en)

Device for transferring labels from a rotary driven first cylinder to a rotary driven second cylinder

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Übergeben von Zetteln von einem rotierend angetriebenen ersten Zylinder an einen rotierend angetriebenen zweiten Zylinder

Title (fr)

Dispositif de transfert d'étiquettes d'un premier cylindre entraîné en rotation vers un deuxième cylindre entraîné en rotation

Publication

EP 0771733 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115621 A

Priority

  • DE 19540616 A
  • DE 19546802 A
  • DE 19621586 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0771733A2] The device transfers sheets between first and second cylinders (1,2) which have rotary drives, and which each work together with a grab in the form of pincers, which have a controlled, pivoting, strip-like jaw (5) which works together with a fixed jaw on the associated cylinder. The grab also has a controlled blade, which pushes a sheet into the open grab of the other cylinder, preferably in order to transfer base covering sheets on a packing machine to a cylinder which applies them to the open bases of continuously supplied pack pieces. The pivoting jaw of each cylinder has a second controller, which can be operated in order to inactivate the pincer movement, and to control the latter so that it takes over the function of the blade. The cylinder diameters are matched so that the activated grab of one cylinder can work together with the activated blade of the other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65C 9/18; B65C 9/40; B65H 29/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 1/04 (2006.01); B65C 9/08 (2006.01); B65H 5/14 (2006.01); B65H 29/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/06 (2013.01); B65H 2403/512 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0771733 A2 19970507; EP 0771733 A3 19980819; EP 0771733 B1 20010509; AT 201008 T 20010515; BR 9605368 A 19980728; CN 1082006 C 20020403; CN 1160005 A 19970924; CZ 9602882 A3 19971015; ES 2156970 T3 20010801; JP 3795594 B2 20060712; JP H09174718 A 19970708; KR 100230089 B1 19991115; US 5947883 A 19990907

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606871

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140930

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-09-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050928

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031011

2003-07-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-06-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-05-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020928

2002-09-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020929

2002-09-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020928

2002-09-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020928

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010924

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010921

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010921

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010823

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010727

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156970 T3

2001-07-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606871 20010613

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201008 T 20010515

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001002

1999-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990219

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT