Global patent index - EP 0771754 B1

EP 0771754 B1 2000-01-26 - Device for assembling flat objects

Title (en)

Device for assembling flat objects

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Zusammenbringen von flächigen Erzeugnissen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour assembler des produits plats

Publication

EP 0771754 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96114758 A

Priority

CH 312495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0771754A1] The device has carrying elements (20) which are arranged one behind another on a tension element (14) which is driven in the direction (U) of circulation. Each carrying element has a supporting element (22) for the products which extends in the longitudinal direction (L). Supply equipment (12) is fitted to the device, and has positions (36) which are arranged behind one another in the direction of circulation, at which it delivers a product to the carrying element which is moving past it. A removal position is arranged downstream from these positions, at which the collected products are withdrawn from the carrying elements. The longitudinal direction of the latter runs at an acute angle (alpha) to the direction of circulation, when viewed from above.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 39/075

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 39/11 (2006.01); B65H 5/32 (2006.01); B65H 29/04 (2006.01); B65H 29/06 (2006.01); B65H 29/66 (2006.01); B65H 31/24 (2006.01); B65H 31/28 (2006.01); B65H 39/075 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 39/075 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4322 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4352 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4356 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4474 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4476 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44795 (2013.01); B65H 2405/352 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2301/4474 + B65H 2220/02
  2. B65H 2301/4476 + B65H 2220/01
  3. B65H 2301/44795 + B65H 2220/01

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0771754 A1 19970507; EP 0771754 B1 20000126; AU 6792296 A 19970508; AU 702313 B2 19990218; CA 2188989 A1 19970504; CA 2188989 C 19990601; DE 59604286 D1 20000302; DK 0771754 T3 20000417; JP H09165137 A 19970624; US 5765823 A 19980616

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141203

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59604286

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-06-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120915

2013-04-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110914

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110914

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110923

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110923

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Owner name: FERAG AG

- Free Format Text: FERAG AG##CH-8340 HINWIL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- FERAG AG#PATENTABTEILUNG Z. H. MARKUS FELIX ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000327

2000-04-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59604286

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000302

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK GB LI SE

1999-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981124

1997-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970315

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK GB LI SE