Global Patent Index - EP 0771827 B1

EP 0771827 B1 2001-05-23 - Process for producing silane-modified polyolefins and extruder apparatus therefor

Title (en)

Process for producing silane-modified polyolefins and extruder apparatus therefor

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von mit Silan modifizierten Polyolefinen und Extruder dafür

Title (fr)

Procédé de production de polyoléfines modifiées par un silane et extrudeuse appropriée

Publication

EP 0771827 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96117138 A

Priority

  • JP 28197295 A
  • JP 1754396 A
  • JP 1754596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0771827A2] An object of the invention is to provide a process for producing a silane-modified polyolefin wherein a stabilized and efficient graft reaction can be effected in the step of modifying a polyolefin with a silane using an extruder. In charging a polyolefin, a vinylsilane compound and a radical polymerization initiator into an extruder and subjecting the charges to a graft reaction, the process of the invention is characterized in that the section of the cylinder barrel of a screw extruder extending from a feed zone to the position immediately preceding a plasticizing zone is set at a temperature lower than the boiling point of the vinylsilane compound. The process of the invention is further characterized in that the vinylsilane compound is injected into the extruder at a position where the polyolefin is subjected to a pressure not lower than the saturation vapor pressure of the vinylsilane compound. The process is further characterized in that when a silanol condensation catalyst is injected, the distance between a front liquid injection port and a vent is so determined that the mean residence time therebetween is 15 seconds to 15 minutes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 255/00; B29C 47/10; B29C 47/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 47/10 (2006.01); B29C 47/76 (2006.01); C08F 255/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 47/767 (2013.01); B29C 47/1063 (2013.01); C08F 255/02 (2013.01); B29C 47/0016 (2013.01); B29C 47/762 (2013.01); B29C 47/92 (2013.01); B29K 2105/0005 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08F 255/02 + C08F 230/08

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0771827 A2 19970507; EP 0771827 A3 19990203; EP 0771827 B1 20010523; DE 69612938 D1 20010628; DE 69612938 T2 20020228

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051025

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031025

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-10-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031025

2002-10-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021017

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20021017

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021001

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020821

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612938 20010628

2001-06-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-03-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000121

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990511

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL