Global Patent Index - EP 0771920 B1

EP 0771920 B1 2001-03-21 - Cylinder lock

Title (en)

Cylinder lock

Title (de)

Schliesszylinder

Title (fr)

Serrure à cylindre

Publication

EP 0771920 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96116610 A

Priority

DE 19541325 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0771920A1] The lock cylinder (10) has a cylinder housing (12) with a bore (14) which accommodates a rotating core (18), and which has at least one bearing surface (16). A group of tumblers (20,22,24,26,28) prevents the core from rotating about its axis (A) in a locked position, and can be freed by a control element, which is especially a key. Each tumbler has a core pin (30,32) in a hole (34,36) in the core, and a housing pin (38,40) in a hole (42,44) in the housing, and the latter pin is spring- loaded towards the former. One end of each core pin is engaged by the key, and in the locked position, this end of one core pin is offset from the others, while all of the core pins have their opposite ends inside their core pin holes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 27/00 (2006.01); E05B 27/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 27/0057 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0771920 A1 19970507; EP 0771920 B1 20010321; AT 199957 T 20010415; DE 19541325 A1 19970507; PL 181906 B1 20011031; PL 316827 A1 19970512

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071016

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2006-11-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061107

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20061024

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-09-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-09-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606622 20010426

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT NL

2001-03-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199957 T 20010415

2000-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991125

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971106

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT NL