Global Patent Index - EP 0771930 B1

EP 0771930 B1 2001-02-28 - Operating device of a closing element comprising a frictional clutch

Title (en)

Operating device of a closing element comprising a frictional clutch

Title (de)

Betätigungsvorrichtung für ein Verschlusselement mit einer Rutschkupplung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de manoeuvre d'un élément de fermeture comprenant un accouplement à friction

Publication

EP 0771930 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96810714 A

Priority

CH 306695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0771930A1] The actuator consists of a motor and reduction gear unit (4) inside a hollow drive shaft. A transmission mechanism (6) between the two enables the shutter to be released when there is a force resisting its descent. The transmission mechanism also has a one-way coupling assembly comprising a disc fixed to the reduction gear output shaft. It also comprises spring-loaded catches which are able to interact with notches in a crown wheel fixed to the hollow shaft. A friction coupling is also contained inside the crown wheel and ensures an friction engagement between the disc of the one-way coupling and a flange fixed to the crown wheel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/72; E04F 10/06; E06B 9/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/56 (2006.01); E04F 10/06 (2006.01); E06B 9/60 (2006.01); E06B 9/62 (2006.01); E06B 9/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/0648 (2013.01); E06B 9/60 (2013.01); E06B 9/62 (2013.01); E06B 9/72 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

CH 688006 A5 19970415; AT 199435 T 20010315; DE 69611877 D1 20010405; EP 0771930 A1 19970507; EP 0771930 B1 20010228; ES 2104542 T1 19971016; JP H09165982 A 19970624; US 5803150 A 19980908

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071026

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOMFY

- Effective date: 20011031

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-08-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010829

2001-05-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010529

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611877 20010405

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199435 T 20010315

2000-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000404

2000-05-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: OPERATING DEVICE OF A CLOSING ELEMENT COMPRISING A FRICTIONAL CLUTCH

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971031

1997-10-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2104542 T1

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE