Global Patent Index - EP 0771944 B1

EP 0771944 B1 2001-03-21 - Crank case for an internal combustion piston engine

Title (en)

Crank case for an internal combustion piston engine

Title (de)

Gehäuse für eine Hubkolben-Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Bâtiment pour un moteur à combustion interne aux pistons

Publication

EP 0771944 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115004 A

Priority

DE 19540763 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19540763C1] The casing has a metallic inner section (1) with cylinders (3,4). The inner section has integrally formed liners (5,6), consisting of the same material. The liners extend between an upper connection plane for the cylinder heads, and a plane, which is located between a lower connection plane and a cover plate (7). Cast stiffening bridges (17) are located in the area of the cover plate between the liners and the screw posts (8). The cover plate has a circumferential claw connection section (20), and a corresponding part of the outer casing section is cast around this.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 7/00; B22D 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 7/0007 (2013.01); F02F 7/0024 (2013.01); F02F 2001/104 (2013.01); F02F 2001/106 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19540763 C1 19961219; AT 199964 T 20010415; CA 2189382 A1 19970503; CA 2189382 C 20050405; EP 0771944 A1 19970507; EP 0771944 B1 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070919

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070919

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070919

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070919

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060906

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060822

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060822

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT FR GB IT

2001-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199964 T 20010415

2000-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000724

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971107

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT FR GB IT